List of Presidents of Singapore
The President of Singapore serves as the country’s head of state. Their job includes making sure the country’s savings (reserves) are used properly and that the big public service jobs are filled by the right people. The President also has the power to say no to some government decisions and laws if they think these are not good for the country. They represent Singapore all over the world and play a big part in bringing Singaporeans together.
The table below lists the Presidents of Singapore, their terms in office, and their affiliated parties :
List of Presidents of Singapore |
||||
---|---|---|---|---|
No. | Name | Term Start | Term End | Party |
1 | Yusof Ishak | 3 December 1959 | 23 November 1970 | Non-partisan |
2 | Benjamin Sheares | 2 January 1971 | 12 May 1981 | Non-partisan |
3 | Devan Nair | 23 October 1981 | 28 March 1985 | Non-partisan |
4 | Wee Kim Wee | 30 September 1985 | 1 September 1993 | Non-partisan |
5 | Ong Teng Cheong | 1 September 1993 | 1 September 1999 | People’s Action Party |
6 | S.R. Nathan | 1 September 1999 | 1 September 2011 | Non-partisan |
7 | Tony Tan Keng Yam | 1 September 2011 | 1 September 2017 | Non-partisan |
8 | Halimah Yacob | 14 September 2017 | Incumbent | People’s Action Party (until 2017, then non-partisan) |
List of Presidents of Singapore
Singapore is a vibrant city-state with a unique political system. At the heart of this system is the role of the President. While many might think of the President as a ceremonial figure, this role carries significant responsibilities that go beyond mere formalities.
In this article, we are going to learn the list of Presidents of Singapore till date, and their specific contributions to the country.
Table of Content
- List of Presidents of Singapore
- Yusof Ishak (1965-1970)
- Benjamin Sheares (1971-1981)
- Devan Nair (1981-1985)
- Wee Kim Wee (1985-1993)
- Ong Teng Cheong (1993-1999)
- S.R. Nathan (1999-2011)
- Tony Tan Keng Yam (2011-2017)
- Halimah Yacob (2017-present)