List of Vice Presidents of the United States
The modern vice presidency is a post of major importance and is usually seen as an essential component of a president’s administration. Since the position was established during the Constitutional Convention of 1787, the role of the vice presidency has evolved significantly.
Here is the List of vice presidents of the United States from the year 1789 till today.
Name |
Tenure |
Party Name |
---|---|---|
John Adams |
21 April 1789- 4 March 1797 |
Pro-Administration/Federalist |
Thomas Jefferson |
4 March 1797- 4 March 1801 |
Democratic-Republican |
Aaron Burr |
4 March 1801- 4 March 1805 |
Democratic-Republican |
George Clinton |
4 March 1805- 20 April 1812 |
Democratic-Republican |
Elbridge Gerry |
4 March 1813- 23 November 1814 |
Democratic-Republican |
Daniel D. Tompkins |
4 March 1817- 4 March 1825 |
Democratic-Republican |
John C. Calhoun |
4 March 1825 – 28 December 1832 |
Democratic-Republican/Nullifier |
Martin Van Buren |
4 March 1833- 4 March 1837 |
Democratic |
Richard M. Johnson |
4 March 1837- 4 March 1841 |
Democratic |
John Tyler |
4 March 1841- 4 April 1841 |
Whig |
George M. Dallas |
4 March 1845- 4 March 1849 |
Democratic |
Millard Fillmore |
4 March 1849- 9 July 1850 |
Whig |
William R. King |
4 March 1853- 18 April 1853 |
Democratic |
John C. Breckinridge |
4 March 1857- 4 March 1861 |
Democratic |
Hannibal Hamlin |
4 March 1861- 4 March 1865 |
Republican |
Andrew Johnson |
4 March 1865- 15 April 1865 |
National Union |
Schuyler Colfax |
4 March 1869- 4 March 1873 |
Republican |
Henry Wilson |
4 March 1873- 22 November 1875 |
Republican |
William A. Wheeler |
4 March 1877- 4 March 1881 |
Republican |
Chester A. Arthur |
4 March 1881- 19 September 1881 |
Republican |
Thomas A. Hendricks |
4 March 1885- 25 November 1885 |
Democratic |
Levi P. Morton |
4 March 1889- 4 March 1893 |
Republican |
Adlai E. Stevenson I |
4 March 1893- 4 March 1897 |
Democratic |
Garret A. Hobart |
4 March 1897- 21 November 1899 |
Republican |
Theodore Roosevelt |
4 March 1901- 14 September 1901 |
Republican |
Charles W. Fairbanks |
4 March 1905- 4 March 1909 |
Republican |
James S. Sherman |
4 March 1909- 30 October 1912 |
Republican |
Thomas R. Marshall |
4 March 1913- 4 March 1921 |
Democratic |
Calvin Coolidge |
4 March 1921- 2 August 1923 |
Republican |
Charles G. Dawes |
4 March 1925- 4 March 1929 |
Republican |
Charles Curtis |
4 March 1929- 4 March 1933 |
Republican |
John Nance Garner |
4 March 1933- 20 January 1941 |
Democratic |
Henry A. Wallace |
20 January 1941- 20 January 1945 |
Democratic |
Henry S. Truman |
20 January 1945- 12 April 1945 |
Democratic |
Alben W. Barkley |
20 January 1949- 20 January 1953 |
Democratic |
Richard Nixon |
20 January 1953- 20 January 1961 |
Republican |
Lyndon B. Johnson |
20 January 1961- 22 November 1963 |
Democratic |
Hubert Humphrey |
20 January 1965- 20 January 1969 |
Democratic |
Spiro Agnew |
20 January 1969- 10 October 1973 |
Republican |
Gerald Ford |
6 December 1973- 9 August 1974 |
Republican |
Nelson Rockefeller |
19 December 1974- 20 January 1977 |
Republican |
Walter Mondale |
20 January 1977- 20 January 1981 |
Democratic |
George H. W. Bush |
20 January 1981- 20 January 1989 |
Republican |
Dan Quayle |
20 January 1989- 20 January 1993 |
Republican |
Al Gore |
20 January 1993- 20 January 2001 |
Democratic |
Dick Cheney |
20 January 2001- 20 January 2009 |
Republican |
Joe Biden |
20 January 2009- 20 January 2017 |
Democratic |
Mike Pence |
20 January 2017- 20 January 2021 |
Republican |
Kamala Harris |
20 January 2021- Ongoing |
Democratic |
List of Vice Presidents of the United States
Vice Presidents of the United States: After the President of the United States, the Vice President of the United States is considered to be the second-highest officer in the executive branch of the national government of the United States. The people of the United States are responsible for electing the Vice-President, together with the President, to a four-year term of office through the Electoral College. Since the office was established in 1789, there have been 49 vice presidents in the United States to date.
The range of the vice president’s roles and functions differ depending on the particular relationship between the president and the vice president but frequently include tasks such as policy making and spokesperson, guiding the president, and being a symbol of American concern or support. In this article, we’ll learn more about all the Vice-Presidents till now, along with their powers, roles, and responsibilities.
Also Read, The Vice President Of India
Table of Content
- List of Vice Presidents of the United States
- Duties And Responsibilities of a Vice President
- Summary – List of Vice Presidents of the United States
- FAQs on List of Vice Presidents of the United States