Deputy Chief Minister of Kerala
The designation of deputy chief minister is not specifed in the Constitution of India. Deputy chief ministers are the second highest ranking member in the Council of Ministers of Kerala state. Till now there are three persons who have served as deputy chief minister. Here are those three ministers who served as deputy chief minister of Kerala state.
Name |
Tenure |
Political Party |
---|---|---|
Raman Sankar |
22nd February 1960 – 26th September 1962 |
Indian National Congress |
CH Mohammed Koya |
28th December 1981 – 17th March 1982 |
Indian Union Muslim League (IUML) |
24th May 1982 – 28th September 1983 |
Indian Union Muslim League (IUML) |
|
K . Avukader Kutty Naha |
24th October 1983 – 25th March 1987 |
Indian Union Muslim League (IUML) |
As of 25th March, 1987, there is no incumbent Deputy Chief Minister in the current government, and the position remains unfilled.
Chief Ministers of Kerala(1957-2023): Tenure, All CM List, Party
Pinarayi Vijayan is the current CM of Kerala. Kerala CM is the head of state governance and administration. As per Article 164, the governor appoints both the Chief Minister and other ministers. Below is the list of CM of Kerala with tenure and party names.