List of Chief Ministers of Rajasthan
Below is the list of Chief Ministers of Rajasthan.
Chief Minister’s Name |
Tenure |
Political Party |
---|---|---|
Heera Lal Shastri |
7 April 1949 to 5 January 1951 |
INC |
C. S. Venkatachari |
6 January 1951 to 25 April 1951 |
INC |
Jai Narayan Vyas |
26 April 1951 to 3 March 1952 |
INC |
Tika Ram Paliwal |
3 March 1952 to 31 October 1952 |
INC |
Jai Narayan Vyas |
|
INC |
Barkatullah Khan |
9 July 1971 to 11 October 1973 |
INC |
Hari Dev Joshi |
11 October 1973 to 29 April 1977 |
INC |
Bhairon Singh Shekhawat |
22 June 1977 to 16 February 1980 |
INC |
Jagannath Pahadia |
6 June 1980 to 13 July 1981 |
INC |
Shiv Charan Mathur |
14 July 1981 to 23 February 1985 |
INC |
Hira Lal Devpura |
23 February 1985 to 10 March 1985 |
INC |
Hari Dev Joshi |
10 March 1985 to 20 January 1988 |
INC |
Shiv Charan Mathur |
20 January 1988 to 4 December 1989 |
INC |
Hari Dev Joshi |
4 December 1989 to 4 March 1990 |
INC |
Bhairon Singh Shekhawat |
4 March 1990 to 15 December 1992 4 December 1993 to 29 November 1998 |
BJP |
Ashok Gehlot |
1 December 1998 to 8 December 2003 |
INC |
Vasundhara Raje |
8 December 2003 to 11 December 2008 |
BJP |
Ashok Gehlot |
12 December 2008 to 13 December 2013 |
INC |
Vasundhara Raje |
13 December 2013 to 16 December 2018 |
BJP |
Ashok Gehlot |
17 December 2018- 12 December 2023 |
INC |
Bhajan Lal Sharma |
12 December 2023 – Present |
BJP |
List of Chief Ministers of Rajasthan(1949 – 2023): Tenure and Party Name
Bhajan Lal Sharma is the current and new CM of Rajasthan. He started his tenure as Rajasthan CM on 12 December 2023. The Chief Minister of Rajasthan plays an important role in the administration and governance of Rajasthan. Check the list of Chief Ministers of Rajasthan with tenure and party names.